Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick O’Donoghue

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lancaster, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1934Born
25 May 196733.0Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
18 May 199359.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
18 May 199359.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tulana
29 Jun 199359.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tulana
5 Jun 200167.0AppointedBishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
4 Jul 200167.1InstalledBishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
1 May 200974.9RetiredBishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
24 Jan 202186.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Lancaster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Patrick O’Donoghue (VIAF: 169246566)
Bishop Patrick O’Donoghue (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lancaster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMourne Abbey, County Cork, Diocese of Cloyne, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Michael, Church, Analeentha, Mourne Abbey, County Cork, Diocese of Cloyne, Ireland
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Death PlaceNazareth House, Mallow, County Cork, Diocese of Cloyne, Ireland
Buried Place (Original)Burnfort, Cemetery, Mourne Abbey, County Cork, Diocese of Cloyne, Ireland

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,160
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • d: CL, 24 Jan 2021
  • c1/23.loc: CL, 7 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Feb 2021

Quantcast