Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Stewart, S.S.C.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1925Born
21 Dec 195025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Society of St. Columban
1 Feb 196640.4AppointedBishop of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)
11 May 196640.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)
21 May 199468.7ResignedBishop of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)
30 Oct 199469.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Thomas Stewart
Bishop Thomas Stewart S.S.C.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ch’unch’ŏn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWoodford, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Columban’s College, Dalgan Park, Galway, Diocese of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 6 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast