Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Sorrentino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pozzuoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1917Born
3 Feb 194022.6Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
16 Jun 196043.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
16 Jun 196043.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gerasa
1 Aug 196043.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gerasa
21 Feb 197456.6AppointedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
8 May 199375.9RetiredBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
20 Jun 200689.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Pozzuoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Sorrentino
Bishop Salvatore Sorrentino (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pozzuoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorre del Greco, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained PriestArchdiocesan Seminary, Chapel, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Death PlaceTorre del Greco, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 66.3 years
  • a bishop for 45.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1960, Number 85
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • c1/loc: AM, 25 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast