Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Crisologo Sorra

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Legazpi, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1929Born
17 Mar 195627.0Ordained PriestPriest of Legazpi, Philippines
27 May 197445.2AppointedBishop of Virac, Philippines
28 Aug 197445.4Ordained BishopBishop of Virac, Philippines
1 Mar 199363.9AppointedBishop of Legazpi, Philippines
1 Apr 200576.0RetiredBishop of Legazpi, Philippines
21 Jan 202191.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Legazpi, Philippines

MicroData Summary for José Crisologo Sorra
Bishop José Crisologo Sorra (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Legazpi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalinao
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Virac, Diocese of Virac
Death PlaceTanchuling, Hospital, Legazpi City, Diocese of Legazpi

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 46.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • mn: CB, 21 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 27, Number 1,516
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 20 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 21 Jan 2021

Quantcast