Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Leslie Smith

Auxiliary Bishop of Portland in Oregon, USA

Titular Bishop of Tubunae in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1958 Born
9 Jun 200143.3Ordained PriestPriest of Portland in Oregon, USA
4 Mar 201456.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Portland in Oregon, USA
4 Mar 201456.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubunae in Mauretania
29 Apr 201456.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tubunae in Mauretania

MicroData Summary for Peter Leslie Smith
Bishop Peter Leslie Smith (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Portland in Oregon

EventPlace
Birth PlacePietermaritzburg, South Africa
Ordained BishopSaint Mary, Cathedral, Portland, Archdiocese of Portland in Oregon

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Portland in Oregon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2014
  • ob: CB, 4 Mar 2014
  • c2+: CB, 10 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast