Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mário Rino Sivieri

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Propriá, Sergipe, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1942Born
3 Jul 196624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Biella, Italy
18 Mar 199754.9AppointedBishop of Propriá, Sergipe, Brazil
25 May 199755.1Ordained BishopBishop of Propriá, Sergipe, Brazil
25 Oct 201775.5RetiredBishop of Propriá, Sergipe, Brazil
3 Jun 202078.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Propriá, Sergipe, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Mário Rino Sivieri
Bishop Mário Rino Sivieri (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Propriá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelmassa
Ordained BishopGinásio de Esporte Ribeirão, Lagarto
Death PlaceAracajú, Archdiocese of Aracajú, Sergipe
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Propriá, Diocese of Propriá, Sergipe

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,008
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2017
  • d: CB, 3 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 4 Jun 2020

Quantcast