Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Masilo John Selemela

Auxiliary Bishop of Pretoria, South Africa

Titular Bishop of Nachingwea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1972 Born
12 Jun 199927.4Ordained PriestPriest of Tzaneen, South Africa
16 Jul 202250.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pretoria, South Africa
16 Jul 202250.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Nachingwea
3 Sep 202250.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nachingwea

MicroData Summary for Masilo John Selemela
Bishop Masilo John Selemela (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Pretoria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMagoebaskloof, Prefecture Apostolic of Louis Trichardt
Ordained BishopMoreletapark Gemeente, Pretoria, Archdiocese of Pretoria

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Pretoria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2022
  • ob: CB, 27 Jul 2022
  • c2+: CB, 23 Aug 2022
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 253, Number 20,992

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022