Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ewaldus Martinus Sedu

Bishop of Maumere, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1963 Born
7 Jul 199127.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ende, Indonesia
14 Dec 200542.3IncardinatedPriest of Maumere, Indonesia
14 Jul 201854.9AppointedBishop of Maumere, Indonesia
26 Sep 201855.1Ordained BishopBishop of Maumere, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Ewaldus Martinus Sedu
Bishop Ewaldus Martinus Sedu (born ) Bishop of Maumere

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBajawa, Archdiocese of Endeh
Ordained BishopGelora Samador da Cunha Stadium, Maumere, Diocese of Maumere

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Maumere.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jul 2018
  • ob: CB, 19 Jul 2018
  • c2+: CB, 9 Sep 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,857

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast