Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Ignaz Philipp von Hessen-Darmstadt

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1699Born
6 Mar 172930.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Augsburg, Germany
13 Mar 172930.1Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
18 Aug 174041.5SelectedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
2 Jan 174141.9ConfirmedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
12 Feb 174142.0Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
20 Aug 176869.5DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ignaz Philipp von Hessen-Darmstadt (VIAF: 17567644)
Bishop Joseph Ignaz Philipp von Hessen-Darmstadt (born , died ) Bishop of Augsburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrussels

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 106
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 568
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast