Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marquard Rudolf von Rodt

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1644Born
26 May 166824.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
14 Apr 168945.0SelectedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
6 Mar 169045.9ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
18 Jun 169046.1Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
10 Jun 170460.1DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Marquard Rudolf von Rodt (VIAF: 81564385)
Bishop Marquard Rudolf von Rodt (born , died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKonstanz, Diocese of Konstanz {Constance}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Konstanz, Diocese of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 170
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 19
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 403
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,483

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast