Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspard Josephus Martinus Bottemanne

Deceased

Bishop of Haarlem, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1823Born
10 Aug 188359.9AppointedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
30 Sep 188360.1Ordained BishopBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
22 May 190379.7DiedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Gaspard Josephus Martinus Bottemanne (VIAF: 88744801)
Bishop Gaspard Josephus Martinus Bottemanne (born , died ) Bishop of Haarlem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlkmaar, Diocese of Haarlem
Ordained BishopGrand Seminary, Warmond, Diocese of Haarlem

  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 50
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 360, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 30 Nov 2020

Quantcast