Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Elmar Schmid, C.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mariannhill, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1913Born
24 Apr 193824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Mariannhill Missionaries
21 May 197056.5AppointedBishop of Mariannhill, South Africa
10 Oct 197056.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mariannhill, South Africa
18 Jun 198066.6DiedBishop of Mariannhill, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Martin Elmar Schmid
Bishop Martin Elmar Schmid C.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Mariannhill

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDewangen (Wurttemberg), Germany
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Mariannhill, Diocese of Mariannhill

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,753
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 554

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast