Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Scarpellini

Deceased

Bishop of El Alto, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1954Born
17 Jun 197824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
15 Jul 201056.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of El Alto, Bolivia
15 Jul 201056.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bida
9 Sep 201056.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bida
25 Jul 201359.5AppointedBishop of El Alto, Bolivia
31 Aug 201359.6InstalledBishop of El Alto, Bolivia
15 Jul 202066.5DiedBishop of El Alto, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Scarpellini
Bishop Eugenio Scarpellini (born , died ) Bishop of El Alto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerdellino, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy
Ordained BishopVirgen de la Candelaria, Cathedral, El Alto, Diocese of El Alto
Death PlaceSagrado Corazón, Hospital, El Alto, Diocese of El Alto
Buried Place (Original)Family Tomb, Cemetery, Verdellino, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,785
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jul 2013
  • bpd: AM, 8 Jul 2019
  • d: CB, 15 Jul 2020
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 Mar 2021

Quantcast