Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pascual Limachi Ortiz

Prelate of Corocoro, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1963 Born
29 Jun 199229.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Paz, Bolivia
25 Jun 199431.1IncardinatedPriest of El Alto, Bolivia
16 Apr 201955.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of El Alto, Bolivia
16 Apr 201955.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Belesasa
26 Jun 201956.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belesasa
10 Feb 202157.7AppointedPrelate of Corocoro, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Pascual Limachi Ortiz
Bishop Pascual Limachi Ortiz (born ) Prelate of Corocoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Paz, Archdiocese of La Paz
Ordained BishopVirgen de Candelaria, Cathedral, El Alto, Diocese of El Alto

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Corocoro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 6 May 2019
  • c34: CB, 26 Jun 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Number 20,168
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 Feb 2021

Quantcast