Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Augustin Chihiro Sato, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sendai, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1926Born
3 Apr 195933.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
24 Jan 197649.8AppointedBishop of Sendai, Japan
20 Mar 197649.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sendai, Japan
19 Jun 199872.2ResignedBishop of Sendai, Japan
12 Nov 200276.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Sendai, Japan

MicroData Summary for Raymond Augustin Chihiro Sato
Bishop Raymond Augustin Chihiro Sato O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sendai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSendai, Diocese of Sendai
Ordained BishopSts. Peter and Paul, Sendai, Diocese of Sendai

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 39, Number 2,428

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast