Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Sánchez Tinoco

Deceased

Bishop of Papantla, Puebla, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1918Born
19 Dec 194224.4Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 195940.6AppointedBishop of Papantla, Puebla, México
22 Mar 195940.7Ordained BishopBishop of Papantla, Puebla, México
19 Oct 197052.3DiedBishop of Papantla, Puebla, México

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Sánchez Tinoco
Bishop Alfonso Sánchez Tinoco (born , died ) Bishop of Papantla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTanhuato

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1959, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast