Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paolo Cardinal Sardi

Deceased

Vice-Chamberlain Emeritus of the Apostolic Chamber

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Auxiliatrice in via Tuscolana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1934Born
29 Jun 195823.8Ordained PriestPriest of Acqui, Italy
10 Dec 199662.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sutrium
10 Dec 199662.2AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
6 Jan 199762.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sutrium
23 Oct 200470.1AppointedVice-Chamberlain of the Apostolic Chamber
20 Nov 201076.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Auxiliatrice in via Tuscolana
20 Nov 201076.2Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jan 201176.3ResignedVice-Chamberlain of the Apostolic Chamber
24 May 201176.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Auxiliatrice in via Tuscolana
13 Jul 201984.8DiedVice-Chamberlain Emeritus of the Apostolic Chamber

MicroData Summary for Paolo Sardi (VIAF: 90241833)
Paolo Cardinal Sardi (born , died ) Vice-Chamberlain Emeritus of Apostolic Chamber

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRicaldone, Diocese of Acqui, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
  • a cardinal for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: Vatican Information Service, 19 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,874
  • d: CB, 13 Jul 2019
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast