Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Léon Émile Santier

Bishop Emeritus of Créteil, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1947 Born
2 Jul 197225.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Coutances (-Avranches), France
7 Jul 197326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Coutances (-Avranches), France
19 Jun 200154.0AppointedBishop of Luçon, France
23 Sep 200154.3Ordained BishopBishop of Luçon, France
4 Sep 200760.2AppointedBishop of Créteil, France
18 Nov 200760.4InstalledBishop of Créteil, France
9 Jan 202173.6ResignedBishop of Créteil, France

MicroData Summary for Michel Léon Émile Santier (VIAF: 71554534)
Bishop Michel Léon Émile Santier (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Créteil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGranville, Diocese of Coutances (-Avranches)
Ordained DeaconSaint-Nicolas, Church, Granville, Diocese of Coutances (-Avranches)
Ordained PriestSaint-Nicolas, Church, Granville, Diocese of Coutances (-Avranches)
Ordained BishopParc des Expositions des Oudairies, La Roche-sur-Yon

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Créteil.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Sep 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,055
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Jan 2021
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast