Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Pedro Sanz y Jordá, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Fukien (Kuiceu), China

Titular Bishop of Mauricastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1680³Born
20 Sep 170424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
29 Jan 172847.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fukien (Kuiceu), China
29 Jan 172847.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Mauricastro
24 Feb 173049.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mauricastro
3 Jan 173251.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Fukien (Kuiceu), China
26 May 174766.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Fukien (Kuiceu), China
14 May 1893Beatified
1 Oct 2000Canonized

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Pedro Sanz y Jordá
Bishop St. Pedro Sanz y Jordá O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Fukien (Kuiceu)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAscó, Archdiocese of Tarragona, Spain
Ordained BishopMacau, Diocese of Macau
Death PlaceFoochow

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 242, Number 1,501
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 261
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 36, Number 2,156

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 12 Apr 2021

Quantcast