Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Sandri, M.C.C.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Witbank, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1946Born
15 Aug 196821.9ProfessedMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
15 Aug 197124.9Solemn VowsMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
27 May 197225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
6 Nov 200963.1AppointedBishop of Witbank, South Africa
31 Jan 201063.4Ordained BishopBishop of Witbank, South Africa
30 May 201972.7DiedBishop of Witbank, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Sandri
Bishop Giuseppe Sandri M.C.C.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Witbank

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFaedo, Archdiocese of Trento, Italy
Ordained BishopMaria Trost Diocesan Pastoral Centre, Lydenburg

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,561
  • d: CB, 30 May 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast