Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Router

Auxiliary Bishop of Armagh, Ireland

Titular Bishop of Lugmad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1965 Born
26 Sep 198722.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Kilmore, Ireland
25 Jun 198924.1Ordained PriestPriest of Kilmore, Ireland
7 May 201954.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Armagh, Ireland
7 May 201954.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lugmad
21 Jul 201954.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lugmad

MicroData Summary for Michael Router
Bishop Michael Router (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRahardrum, Virginia, Diocese of Kilmore
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, Armagh, Archdiocese of Armagh

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Armagh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 May 2019
  • od/c01: CB, 7 May 2019
  • ob: CB, 11 May 2019
  • c2+: CB, 17 Jul 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,213

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast