Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clemente Riva, I.C. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Atella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1922Born
24 Mar 195128.8Ordained PriestPriest of Institute of Charity
24 May 197552.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
24 May 197552.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Atella
22 Jun 197553.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Atella
3 Jul 199876.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
30 Mar 199976.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Clemente Riva (VIAF: 79507653)
Bishop Clemente Riva I.C. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedolago
Ordained BishopSan Ambrogio al Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,727

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast