Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Rinaldi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1901Born
11 Apr 192523.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 195654.8AppointedBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
22 Apr 195654.9Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
197775.6RetiredBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
21 Oct 197776.4DiedBishop Emeritus of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Rinaldi
Bishop Luigi Rinaldi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Marco e Bisignano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast