Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Gabriel Ramírez Díaz

Bishop of Ocaña, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1965 Born
12 Jun 199327.6Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Marta, Colombia
17 Jan 200640.2IncardinatedPriest of El Banco, Colombia
24 Apr 201347.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of El Banco, Colombia
18 Jun 201448.6AppointedBishop of El Banco, Colombia
23 Aug 201448.8Ordained BishopBishop of El Banco, Colombia
27 Feb 202155.3AppointedBishop of Ocaña, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Luis Gabriel Ramírez Díaz
Bishop Luis Gabriel Ramírez Díaz (born ) Bishop of Ocaña

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarranquilla, Archdiocese of Barranquilla
Ordained BishopMaría Reina, Cathedral, Barranquilla, Archdiocese of Barranquilla

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ocaña.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 22 Jun 2014
  • bp/bd: CB, 20 Aug 2014
  • c34: CB, 22 Aug 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,273
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Feb 2021

Quantcast