Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco José Prieto Fernández

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Titular Bishop of Vergi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1968 Born
26 Jun 199324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Orense, Spain
28 Jan 202152.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
28 Jan 202152.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Vergi
10 Apr 202152.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vergi

MicroData Summary for Francisco José Prieto Fernández
Bishop Francisco José Prieto Fernández (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrense, Diocese of Orense
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santiago de Compostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2021
  • ob: CB, 28 Jan 2021
  • c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2021
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Apr 2021

Quantcast