Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Oca Presto

Bishop of San Fernando de La Union, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1963 Born
1 Dec 199027.6Ordained PriestPriest of Iba, Philippines
9 May 201855.0AppointedBishop of San Fernando de La Union, Philippines
30 Jul 201855.3Ordained BishopBishop of San Fernando de La Union, Philippines
2 Aug 201855.3InstalledBishop of San Fernando de La Union, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Daniel Oca Presto
Bishop Daniel Oca Presto (born ) Bishop of San Fernando de La Union

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMangalda, Pangasinan, Diocese of Iba
Ordained BishopSt. Columban, Church, Olongapo City, Diocese of Iba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Fernando de La Union.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 May 2018
  • mn: CB, 9 May 2018
  • ob/i: CB, 26 May 2018
  • c34: CB, 25 Jul 2018
  • c34: CB, 29 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,828

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast