Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Pol y Baralt

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1854Born
20 Dec 187925.5Ordained PriestPriest of Gerona, Spain
6 Dec 190652.4AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
16 Jun 190753.0Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
6 Jun 191459.9DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Pol y Baralt
Bishop Francisco de Pol y Baralt (born , died ) Bishop of Gerona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArenys de Mar, Diocese of Gerona
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Church, Arenyo del Mare, Diocese of Gerona

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1907, Number 32
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Number 6,007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast