Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín José Bernaus y Serra, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bluefields, Nicaragua

Titular Bishop of Milopotamos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1863Born
6 Apr 188925.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 May 191349.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Guam, Pacific (Oceania)
9 May 191349.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Milopotamos
8 Sep 191350.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milopotamos
14 Sep 191350.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bluefields, Nicaragua
18 Jan 193066.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Bluefields, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Agustín José Bernaus y Serra
Bishop Agustín José Bernaus y Serra O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bluefields

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArtesa de Segre, Spain

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1913, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast