Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Guillamet y Coma

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1856Born
21 Dec 187822.7Ordained PriestPriest of Gerona, Spain
29 Apr 190953.0AppointedBishop of León, Spain
10 Oct 190953.5Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
18 Jul 191357.3AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
22 Apr 192064.0AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
14 Apr 192670.0DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Guillamet y Coma
Bishop Ramón Guillamet y Coma (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlot

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 80
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1909, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast