Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edoardo Piana Agostinetti

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Novara, Italy

Titular Bishop of Euroea in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1896Born
16 Dec 192327.2Ordained PriestPriest of Novara, Italy
21 Jul 195861.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Novara, Italy
21 Jul 195861.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Euroea in Phoenicia
14 Sep 195862.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Euroea in Phoenicia
14 Jan 197679.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Edoardo Piana Agostinetti
Bishop Edoardo Piana Agostinetti (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrnavasso
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de l'Assomption, Cathedral, Novara, Diocese of Novara

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 712

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast