Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Pasotto, C.S.S.

Apostolic Administrator of Caucaso, Armenia

Titular Bishop of Musti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1954 Born
12 May 197924.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Stigmata
29 Nov 199642.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Caucaso, Armenia
9 Nov 199945.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Musti
6 Jan 200045.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Musti

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Pasotto
Bishop Giuseppe Pasotto C.S.S. (born ) Apostolic Administrator of Caucaso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBovolone
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Administration of Caucaso.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,669
  • c1: CB, 24 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast