Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Pamplany

Archbishop of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1969 Born
30 Dec 199728.0Ordained PriestPriest of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar), India
1 Sep 201747.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar), India
1 Sep 201747.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Numluli
8 Nov 201747.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Numluli
15 Jan 202252.0AppointedArchbishop of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar), India
20 Apr 202252.3InstalledArchbishop of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Pamplany
(VIAF: 3674163159957801640000; WikiData: Q38263754)
Archbishop Joseph Pamplany (born ) Archbishop of Tellicherry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCharal, Eparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar)
Ordained BishopIn front of, Saint Joseph's, Cathedral, Thalassery, Archeparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2017
  • opd/c1: CB, 4 Sep 2017
  • ob: CB, 7 Sep 2017
  • c2+: CB, 8 Nov 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,601
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2022
  • i: CB, 11 Mar 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 24 May 2023