Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Pak Jeong-il

Bishop Emeritus of Masan, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1926 Born
23 Nov 195831.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 197750.3AppointedBishop of Cheju, Korea (South)
31 May 197750.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cheju, Korea (South)
8 Jun 198255.4AppointedBishop of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}, Korea (South)
15 Dec 198861.9AppointedBishop of Masan, Korea (South)
11 Nov 200275.8RetiredBishop of Masan, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Michael Pak Jeong-il
Bishop Michael Pak Jeong-il (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Masan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceP'yongnam
Ordained BishopCheju City, Diocese of Cheju

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Masan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 43, Number 2,868

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast