Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Mary O’Shea, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Ingwavuma, South Africa

Titular Bishop of Ath Truim


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1930Born
8 Jul 195625.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
9 Jan 197645.3AppointedPrefect of Ingwavuma, South Africa
19 Nov 199060.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ath Truim
19 Nov 199060.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ingwavuma, South Africa
6 Apr 199160.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ath Truim
30 May 200675.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Ingwavuma, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Michael Mary O’Shea
Bishop Michael Mary O’Shea O.S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Ingwavuma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCurraheen, Ireland

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,443
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast