Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Cota de Oliveira

Bishop of Sete Lagoas, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1969 Born
1 Aug 199929.9Ordained PriestPriest of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil
7 Jun 201747.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
7 Jun 201747.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Fiorentino
26 Aug 201748.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fiorentino
8 Sep 201748.0InstalledAuxiliary Bishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
10 Jun 202050.8AppointedBishop of Sete Lagoas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
1 Aug 202050.9InstalledBishop of Sete Lagoas, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco Cota de Oliveira
Bishop Francisco Cota de Oliveira (born ) Bishop of Sete Lagoas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOnça do Pitangui, Diocese of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais
Ordained BishopComplexo Esportivo da Universidade, Itaúna

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sete Lagoas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jun 2017
  • c1: CB, 7 Jun 2017
  • ob: CB, 7 Jun 2017
  • ob: CB, 9 Jun 2017
  • c2+: CB, 6 Jul 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,503
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2020
  • i: CB, 10 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast