Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Albert Kanene Obiefuna

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Onitsha, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1930Born
21 Dec 196333.8Ordained PriestPriest of Onitsha, Nigeria
10 Nov 197747.7AppointedBishop of Awka, Nigeria
5 Feb 197848.0Ordained BishopBishop of Awka, Nigeria
9 Sep 199464.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Onitsha, Nigeria
25 Feb 199565.0SucceededArchbishop of Onitsha, Nigeria
1 Sep 200373.5ResignedArchbishop of Onitsha, Nigeria
11 May 201181.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Onitsha, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Albert Kanene Obiefuna
Archbishop Albert Kanene Obiefuna (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Onitsha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOraukwu
Ordained BishopAwka, Diocese of Awka

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,887

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Feb 2021

Quantcast