Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rudolf Nyandoro

Bishop of Gweru, Zimbabwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1968 Born
19 Dec 199830.1Ordained PriestPriest of Masvingo, Zimbabwe
28 Jan 201748.2AppointedBishop of Gokwe, Zimbabwe
29 Apr 201748.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gokwe, Zimbabwe
11 Sep 202051.9AppointedBishop of Gweru, Zimbabwe
24 Oct 202052.0InstalledBishop of Gweru, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Rudolf Nyandoro (VIAF: 171526846)
Bishop Rudolf Nyandoro (born ) Bishop of Gweru

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGweru, Diocese of Gwelo
Ordained BishopGrounds of St. Paul School, Gokwe, Diocese of Gokwe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gweru.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2017
  • ob: CB, 22 Feb 2017
  • c2+: CB, 30 Apr 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,414
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Sep 2020
  • i: CB, 11 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast