Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Jesús Nuñez Viloria

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Guayana, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1938 Born
12 Aug 196224.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 198244.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ciudad Bolívar, Venezuela
8 Jan 198244.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cenae
19 Mar 198244.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cenae
13 Jan 198749.0AppointedBishop of Ciudad Guayana, Venezuela
21 Jul 199052.5ResignedBishop of Ciudad Guayana, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús Nuñez Viloria
Bishop José de Jesús Nuñez Viloria (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Guayana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBetijoque
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Trujillo, Diocese of Trujillo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ciudad Guayana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 74, Number 5,932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast