Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Moïse Eugène Noyer

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Amiens, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1927Born
2 Jul 195023.2Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 198760.5AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
13 Dec 198760.6Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
10 Mar 200375.8RetiredBishop of Amiens, France
2 Jun 202093.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Moïse Eugène Noyer (VIAF: 5070114)
Bishop Jacques Moïse Eugène Noyer (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Amiens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Touquet-Paris-Plage
Ordained BishopNotre Dame, Cathedral, Amiens, Diocese of Amiens
Death PlaceLe Touquet

  • a priest for 69.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,267
  • d: CB, 2 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 2 Jun 2020

Quantcast