Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-François-Marie-Pierre Derouet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1922Born
26 Jun 194825.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Oct 197047.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France
21 Oct 197047.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Obbi
6 Dec 197048.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Obbi
24 Jul 197148.6SucceededBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
10 Oct 198562.8AppointedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
12 Aug 199875.7RetiredBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
4 Jul 200481.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France

MicroData Summary for Henri-François-Marie-Pierre Derouet
Bishop Henri-François-Marie-Pierre Derouet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoire
Ordained BishopSaint-Maurice, Cathedral, Angers, Diocese of Angers

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 564

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 27 Jun 2020

Quantcast