Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Phocas Nikwigize

Bishop Emeritus of Ruhengeri, Rwanda

Note/Previous Titular See: (Probably Died on 30 Nov 1996)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1919 Born
25 Jul 194828.9Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 196849.0AppointedBishop of Ruhengeri, Rwanda
30 Nov 196849.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ruhengeri, Rwanda
5 Jan 199676.3RetiredBishop of Ruhengeri, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Phocas Nikwigize (VIAF: 645149416742789730005)
Bishop Phocas Nikwigize (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ruhengeri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuhango
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ruhengeri, Diocese of Ruhengeri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ruhengeri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2017, Page 617
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 435
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast