Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Pastor Neelankavil, C.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sagar (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1930Born
15 Oct 195121.5First VowsMember of Carmelites of Mary Immaculate
17 May 196030.1Ordained PriestPriest of Carmelites of Mary Immaculate
20 Dec 198656.7AppointedBishop of Sagar (Syro-Malabar), India
22 Feb 198756.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sagar (Syro-Malabar), India
2 Feb 200675.8RetiredBishop of Sagar (Syro-Malabar), India
17 Feb 202190.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Sagar (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Pastor Neelankavil
Bishop Joseph Pastor Neelankavil C.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sagar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAranattukara
Ordained BishopS. Raphael, Church, Sagar, Diocese of Sagar (Syro-Malabar)

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 103, Number 8,958
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 104, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • firs/c1/d: CB, 16 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Feb 2021

Quantcast