Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christoph Nebel

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Titular Bishop of Capharnaum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1690Born
10 Jun 171323.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mainz, Germany
23 Sep 171323.4Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
18 Dec 173343.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
18 Dec 173343.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
24 Jan 173443.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
23 May 176979.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Christoph Nebel
Bishop Christoph Nebel (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchwabenheim
Ordained BishopLa Cour, Chapel, Mainz, Archdiocese of Mainz

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 145, and Page 453
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,614
  • b/c2+: ATh
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,240
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast