Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Nikolaus (Febronius) von Hontheim

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

Titular Bishop of Myriophytos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1701Born
15 Jun 172625.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trier, Germany
22 May 172827.3Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
2 Dec 174847.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
2 Dec 174847.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Myriophytos
16 Feb 174948.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myriophytos
2 Sep 179089.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Nikolaus (Febronius) von Hontheim
Bishop Johann Nikolaus (Febronius) von Hontheim (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrier
Ordained BishopMainz, Archdiocese of Mainz

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 299, and Page 453
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 48, Number 3,280

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast