Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcellin-Marie Ndabnyemb

Bishop of Batouri, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1965 Born
13 Apr 199630.8Ordained PriestPriest of Douala, Cameroon
25 Apr 201852.8AppointedBishop of Batouri, Cameroon
7 Jul 201853.0Ordained BishopBishop of Batouri, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Marcellin-Marie Ndabnyemb
Bishop Marcellin-Marie Ndabnyemb (born ) Bishop of Batouri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLogbikoy, Diocese of Douala
Ordained BishopCollčge Catholique Bary stadium, Batouri, Diocese of Batouri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Batouri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2018
  • ob: CB, 30 May 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,815

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast