Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Stanisław Naruszewicz, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1733Born
10 Jan 176228.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Jesus
17 Jan 176228.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
1773¹39.1IncardinatedPriest
13 Mar 177541.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
13 Mar 177541.3AppointedTitular Bishop of EmmaŁs
28 May 177541.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of EmmaŁs
28 Nov 178855.1SucceededBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
3 Jun 179056.6SelectedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
29 Nov 179057.1ConfirmedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
6 Jul 179662.7DiedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adam Stanisław Naruszewicz
Bishop Adam Stanisław Naruszewicz S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLakiszynen
Ordained BishopVarsovie

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 208, and Page 267
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 382
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1775, Number 19
  • inca: CB, 22 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 48, Number 3,287

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast