Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonin Malinowski, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

Titular Bishop of Cinna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1742Born
24 Nov 175816.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Sep 178239.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
23 Sep 178239.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cinna
22 Dec 178240.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cinna
30 Jun 181673.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Antonin Malinowski
Bishop Antonin Malinowski O.P. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrodnensi
Ordained BishopO.P., Church, Varsovie

  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 165, and Page 454
  • ob/c2+: CB, 15 Sep 2014
  • c3: CB, 24 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,251
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1782, Number 20
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,535

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast