Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fulgence Muteba Mugalu

Archbishop of Lubumbashi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Apostolic Administrator of Kamina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1962 Born
5 Aug 199028.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kongolo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
18 Mar 200542.6AppointedBishop of Kilwa-Kasenga, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
23 Jul 200543.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kilwa-Kasenga, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
3 Dec 202058.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kamina, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
22 May 202158.8AppointedArchbishop of Lubumbashi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
10 Jul 202159.0InstalledArchbishop of Lubumbashi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Fulgence Muteba Mugalu
Archbishop Fulgence Muteba Mugalu (born ) Archbishop of Lubumbashi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKongolo
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Kasenga, Diocese of Kilwa-Kasenga

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lubumbashi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,948
  • aadm: CB, 4 Dec 2020
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 May 2021
  • i: AM, 25 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Jun 2021

Quantcast