Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Mura

Bishop of Nuoro, Italy

Bishop of Lanusei


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1952 Born
1 Aug 197926.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bosa, Italy
30 Sep 198633.7IncardinatedPriest of Alghero-Bosa, Italy
31 Jan 201461.0AppointedBishop of Lanusei, Italy
25 Mar 201461.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lanusei, Italy
27 Apr 201461.3InstalledBishop of Lanusei, Italy
2 Jul 201966.5AppointedBishop of Nuoro, Italy
2 Jul 201966.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lanusei, Italy
15 Sep 201966.7InstalledBishop of Nuoro, Italy
9 Apr 202067.2AppointedBishop of Lanusei, Italy
27 May 202067.4InstalledBishop of Lanusei, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Mura
Bishop Antonio Mura (born ) Bishop of Nuoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBortigali, Diocese of Bosa
Ordained PriestSanta Maria degli Angeli, Church, Bortigali, Diocese of Bosa
Ordained BishopMaria Immacolata, Co-Cathedral, Bosa, Diocese of Alghero-Bosa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nuoro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2/i: CB, 8 Feb 2014
  • c34: CB, 25 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,121
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Apr 2020
  • i: AM, 25 Jun 2020
  • c1: AM, 1 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast