Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Muñagorri y Obineta, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bùi Chu, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Pityus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1865Born
13 Sep 188116.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
20 Jul 188823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Aug 190742.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam
13 Aug 190742.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Pityus
5 Jan 190842.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pityus
17 Jun 193670.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Bùi Chu, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Pedro Muñagorri y Obineta
Bishop Pedro Muñagorri y Obineta O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bùi Chu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBerástegui, Spain
Ordained BishopBùi Chu, Vicariate Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1908, Number 1
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,878

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast